Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Marco Antonio Órdenes Fernández


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1964 Born
14 Dec 199632.1Ordained PriestPriest of Iquique, Chile
23 Oct 200641.9AppointedBishop of Iquique, Chile
18 Nov 200642.0Ordained BishopBishop of Iquique, Chile
9 Oct 201247.9ResignedBishop of Iquique, Chile
11 Oct 201853.9Laicized

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Órdenes Fernández
(Layman) Marco Antonio Órdenes Fernández (born )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIquique
Ordained BishopSanctuaire Nuestra Señora del Carmen, La Tirana

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,279
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2012
  • laic: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Oct 2018

Quantcast