Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Eduardo Vargas Bastidas, S.D.B.

Bishop of Temuco, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1951 Born
1978²26.0ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Jul 197826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Nov 200351.9AppointedBishop of Arica, Chile
4 Jan 200452.0Ordained BishopBishop of Arica, Chile
14 May 201361.3AppointedBishop of Temuco, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Héctor Eduardo Vargas Bastidas
Bishop Héctor Eduardo Vargas Bastidas S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Temuco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValdivia
Ordained BishopIn front of, San Marcos, Cathedral, Arica, Diocese of Arica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Temuco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,494
  • dname: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2011, Number 21
  • dname: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 103, Page 776
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 May 2013
  • c1: CB, 13 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast