Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Egger

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Gallen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1833BornUnterschönau
22 Mar 185622.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
17 May 185622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
25 May 188248.8SelectedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
3 Jul 188248.9ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
6 Aug 188249.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
12 Mar 190672.6DiedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Augustin Egger:
Bishop Augustin Egger (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Gallen

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 499

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013