Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph Frederick Otto Zardetti

Deceased

Official of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Archbishop of Mocissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1847Born
21 Aug 187023.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 188942.6AppointedBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
20 Oct 188942.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
6 Mar 189447.1AppointedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
25 May 189548.3ResignedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
25 May 189548.3AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
12 Jun 189548.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
10 May 190255.2DiedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Frederick Otto Zardetti (VIAF: 67230817)
Archbishop John Joseph Frederick Otto Zardetti (born , died ) Official of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRorschach, Switzerland
Ordained BishopEinsiedlen, Switzerland

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 161, and Page 211
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017