Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidore Klaus, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}, Ghana

Titular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1864Born
13 Jul 189025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
4 Mar 190439.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}, Ghana
4 Mar 190439.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
19 Jun 190439.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
20 Nov 190541.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Isidore Klaus
Bishop Isidore Klaus S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchauholzersweilem, Switzerland

  • a priest for 15.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast