Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophore Cosandey

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1818Born
18 Dec 184123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
19 Dec 187961.0AppointedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
15 Feb 188061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
1 Oct 188263.7DiedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Christophore Cosandey (VIAF: 122109618)
Bishop Christophore Cosandey (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne et Genève

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGiffers
Ordained BishopS. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Mar 2017