Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm von Reiser

Deceased

Bishop of Rottenburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1835BornEgesheim
10 Aug 185924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
31 Aug 188651.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany
31 Aug 188651.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aenus
14 Nov 188651.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aenus
5 Jun 189358.1SucceededBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
11 Jul 189358.2InstalledBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
11 May 189863.0DiedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm von Reiser:
Bishop Wilhelm von Reiser (born , died ) Bishop of Rottenburg

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 79, and Page 487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013