Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste-Léon-Alexis Cesbron

Deceased

Bishop of Annecy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1887BornVezins
29 Jun 191022.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 194052.8AppointedBishop of Annecy, France
30 Nov 194053.0Ordained BishopBishop of Annecy, France
13 Jul 196274.6DiedBishop of Annecy, France

MicroData Summary for Auguste-Léon-Alexis Cesbron:
Bishop Auguste-Léon-Alexis Cesbron (born , died ) Bishop of Annecy

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013