Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Camille Costes

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1873Born
5 Apr 189622.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 192450.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Angers, France
3 Apr 192450.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
24 Jun 192451.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
9 Feb 194066.8SucceededBishop of Angers, France
14 Feb 195076.8DiedBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Camille Costes
Bishop Jean-Camille Costes (born , died ) Bishop of Angers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Sylvestre-sur-Lot

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast