Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Baptiste Joseph Scotto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1913Born
29 Jun 193623.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Aug 197057.3AppointedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
3 Oct 197057.5Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
25 Mar 198369.9ResignedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
8 Sep 199380.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria

MicroData Summary for Jean Baptiste Joseph Scotto
Bishop Jean Baptiste Joseph Scotto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHussein Dey
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Alger, Archdiocese of Alger

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 549

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast