Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Evariste-Joseph Coeuret-Varin

Deceased

Bishop of Agen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1838BornBordéaux
30 May 186324.8Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 188546.5SelectedBishop of Agen, France
27 Mar 188546.6ConfirmedBishop of Agen, France
26 May 188546.8Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
23 Feb 190566.5DiedBishop of Agen, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Evariste-Joseph Coeuret-Varin:
Bishop Charles-Evariste-Joseph Coeuret-Varin (born , died ) Bishop of Agen

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013