Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valério do Sacramento, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1680³BornCampo Grande
1 Jun 170524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jul 173857.6SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
3 Sep 173857.7ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
5 Oct 173857.8Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
14 Jul 175675.6ResignedBishop of Angra, Portugal
6 Nov 176079.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Angra, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valério do Sacramento:
Bishop Valério do Sacramento O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Angra

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014