Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel da Cruz Nogueira, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1690³BornCasa Real, Portugal
25 Feb 171222.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Cistercians
28 Feb 171222.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
21 Jul 173848.4SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
3 Sep 173848.5ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
14 Dec 173848.8Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
1 Sep 174555.5SelectedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
15 Dec 174555.8ConfirmedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
3 Jan 176473.9DiedBishop of Mariana, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manoel da Cruz Nogueira:
Bishop Manoel da Cruz Nogueira O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Mariana

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 268, and Page 276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015