Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diogo Marques Morato

Deceased

Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1670³BornTavira
21 Sep 169424.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 173969.0SelectedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
19 Dec 174070.9ConfirmedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
9 Apr 174171.2Ordained BishopBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
29 Dec 174979.9DiedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diogo Marques Morato:
Bishop Diogo Marques Morato (born , died ) Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015