Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Liguori Morapeli, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Maseru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1929BornHa Motebang
14 Dec 195829.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
13 Apr 196737.8AppointedArchbishop of Maseru, Lesotho
29 Jun 196738.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Maseru, Lesotho
18 Jun 196839.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Leribe, Lesotho
Jul 197041.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Leribe, Lesotho
17 May 198959.9DiedArchbishop of Maseru, Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Liguori Morapeli:
Archbishop Alfonso Liguori Morapeli O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Maseru

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015