Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Herman Joseph Meysing, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bloemfontein

Titular Archbishop of Dercos (Dercus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1886BornBirkungen, Germany
9 Jul 191124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Dec 192943.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale}, South Africa
19 Dec 192943.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mina
19 Mar 193043.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mina
11 Jan 195164.3AppointedArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa
25 Jun 195467.8ResignedArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa
25 Jun 195467.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dercos (Dercus)
21 Oct 196377.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bloemfontein, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Herman Joseph Meysing:
Archbishop Herman Joseph Meysing O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bloemfontein

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1930, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013