Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Douglas John Lucia

Bishop of Syracuse, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1963 Born
20 May 198926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
4 Jun 201956.2AppointedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
8 Aug 201956.3Ordained BishopBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Douglas John Lucia
Bishop Douglas John Lucia (born ) Bishop of Syracuse

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlattsburgh, Diocese of Ogdensburg, New York
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Syracuse, Diocese of Syracuse, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Syracuse.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2019
  • c1/mn: CB, 4 Jun 2019
  • ob: CB, 6 Jun 2019
  • c2: CB, 19 Jun 2019
  • c34: CB, 27 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 10 Aug 2019

Quantcast