Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Joseph Colacicco

Auxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Erdonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1955 Born
6 Nov 198227.1Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
10 Oct 201964.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
10 Oct 201964.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Erdonia
10 Dec 201964.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erdonia

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Joseph Colacicco
Bishop Gerardo Joseph Colacicco (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoughkeepsie, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick’s, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of New York.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Oct 2019
  • mn/c34: CB, 28 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast