Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre-Bernard Castillon

Deceased

Bishop of Dijon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1828Born
5 Jun 185526.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 188556.5SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
27 Mar 188556.7ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
25 Jul 188557.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
9 Nov 188557.3DiedBishop of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre-Bernard Castillon
Bishop Jean-Pierre-Bernard Castillon (born , died ) Bishop of Dijon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMerville
Ordained BishopS. Etienne, Cathedral, Toulouse, Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017