Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

Dioecesis S. Dionysii Reunionis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 27 September 1850
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Réunion
  • Square Kilometers: 2,600 (1,004 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-reunion.org/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 36 rue de Paris, B.P. 55, 97461 St.-Denis-de-La-Reunion CEDEX, La Reunion
  • Telephone: 94.85.70
  • Fax: 94.85.71

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Islands of the Indian Ocean
1712ErectedDiocese of Malacca Prefecture Apostolic of Islands of the Indian Ocean (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Bourbon
1818ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Islands of the Indian Ocean Prefecture Apostolic of Bourbon
1841Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Bourbon Prefecture Apostolic of Madagascar (erected)
Diocese of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
27 September 1850ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bourbon Diocese of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
26 February 1860Territory LostDiocese of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion Prefecture Apostolic of Zanguebar (erected) ((or 12 Nov 1862))

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
1949229,488243,18794.4%3141723,1873233457ap1951
1970420,000440,00095.5%52591113,78310748965ap1971
1980448,000490,00091.4%58551133,9649743069ap1981
1990520,000580,00089.7%58481064,90518841375ap1991
1999590,000640,00092.2%5245976,08278238675ap2000
2000590,000640,00092.2%55471025,784138434675ap2001
2001595,000645,00092.2%58521105,409138650575ap2004
2010644,000806,00079.9%65621275,070197528671ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 3 Apr 2013