Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José de Calasanz Félix Santiago Cardinal Vives y Tutó, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1854BornSan Andrés de Llevaneras, Spain
12 Jul 187016.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
26 May 187723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Jun 189945.3Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 189945.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
26 Oct 190854.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
7 Sep 191359.6DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious

MicroData Summary for José de Calasanz Félix Santiago Vives y Tutó:
Cardinal José de Calasanz Félix Santiago Vives y Tutó O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect of Affairs of Religious

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a cardinal for 14.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1899

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013