Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Cazet, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale}

Titular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1827BornJourançon, France
23 May 186133.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Aug 187245.0AppointedPrefect of Madagascar, Madagascar
5 May 188557.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina
5 May 188557.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Madagascar, Madagascar
11 Oct 188558.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina
30 Aug 191184.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale}, Madagascar
6 Mar 191890.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale}, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Cazet:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Cazet S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale}

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 525

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013