Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Dedza

Dioecesis Dedzaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Emmanuele Kanyama, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 25 April 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lilongwe
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Malawi
  • Square Kilometers: 4,250 (1,641 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 80, Dedza, Malawi
  • Telephone: (1)223.228; 223.103
  • Fax: 223.264; 223.246

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Dedza
29 April 1956ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Likuni
Vicariate Apostolic of Zomba
Vicariate Apostolic of Dedza (erected)
Diocese of Dedza
25 April 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Dedza Diocese of Dedza
9 February 2011Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Dedza (from Blantyre)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Dedza
1969108,455393,99127.5%2319422,582283911ap1971
1980349,595590,00059.3%2119408,739344214ap1981
1990271,000807,00033.6%3921604,516218215ap1991
1999332,7351,010,00032.9%389477,079269315ap2000
2000336,0001,023,00032.8%359447,636108515ap2001
2001410,230885,24146.3%389478,72899715ap2002
2002420,0881,000,24142.0%398478,93889415ap2003
2003426,9481,100,89538.8%3384110,413219515ap2004
2004438,1511,112,75439.4%27103711,841209315ap2005
2006459,3981,173,00039.2%2993812,089208715ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 3 Jul 2013