Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Guy Couture

Bishop Emeritus of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1929 Born
30 May 195324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
21 Jun 197546.1AppointedBishop of Hauterive, Québec, Canada
15 Aug 197546.2Ordained BishopBishop of Hauterive, Québec, Canada
5 Apr 197949.9AppointedBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
5 Jun 197950.0InstalledBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
19 Jun 200475.1RetiredBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean-Guy Couture
Bishop Jean-Guy Couture (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chicoutimi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Jean-Baptiste de Québec
Ordained BishopHauterive, Diocese of Hauterive, Québec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chicoutimi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,836

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast