Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Hubert

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1929BornBeloeil
30 May 195323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
25 Jun 197142.0AppointedBishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
12 Sep 197142.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
27 Jan 197747.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Québec, Québec, Canada
3 May 197848.9SucceededBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Québec, Québec, Canada
2 Feb 199666.6DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Bernard Hubert:
Bishop Bernard Hubert (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015