Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alphonsus Liguori Penney

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1924Born
29 Jun 194924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
23 Nov 197248.1AppointedBishop of Grand Falls, Newfoundland, Canada
18 Jan 197348.3Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Falls, Newfoundland, Canada
28 Mar 197954.5AppointedArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
31 May 197954.7InstalledArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
2 Feb 199166.3ResignedArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
12 Dec 201793.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alphonsus Liguori Penney
Archbishop Alphonsus Liguori Penney (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Johnís, Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland
Death PlaceSaint Johnís, Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

  • a priest for 68.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • d: CB, 13 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018