Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Joseph Komba

Deceased

Archbishop of Songea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
May 1922³BornLituhi
15 Jul 195432.2Ordained PriestPriest of Peramiho, Tanzania
22 Dec 196139.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Peramiho, Tanzania
22 Dec 196139.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thignica
3 May 196240.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thignica
6 Feb 196946.8AppointedBishop of Songea, Tanzania
18 Nov 198765.5AppointedArchbishop of Songea, Tanzania
1 Feb 199269.8DiedArchbishop of Songea, Tanzania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Joseph Komba:
Archbishop James Joseph Komba (died ) Archbishop of Songea

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013