Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Dominic Sangu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mbeya, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1920Born
7 Sep 194727.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 196645.8AppointedBishop of Mbeya, Tanzania
11 Sep 196646.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mbeya, Tanzania
28 Nov 199676.3RetiredBishop of Mbeya, Tanzania
26 Jul 199878.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Mbeya, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for James Dominic Sangu
Bishop James Dominic Sangu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbeya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZimba

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast