Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasile Hossu

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1919BornCarei
4 Feb 194929.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
14 Mar 199070.8AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
27 May 199071.0Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
18 Jun 199778.1DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Vasile Hossu:
Bishop Vasile Hossu (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,878
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013