Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert Soegijapranata, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Semarang

Vicar Apostolic of Indonesia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1896BornSoerakarta
15 Aug 193134.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1 Aug 194043.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Semarang, Indonesia
1 Aug 194043.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Danaba
6 Nov 194043.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Danaba
25 Dec 194953.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Indonesia, Military
3 Jan 196164.1AppointedArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia
22 Jul 196366.7DiedArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Albert Soegijapranata:
Archbishop Albert Soegijapranata S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Semarang

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013