Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Maryadi Sutrisnaatmaka, M.S.F.

Bishop of Palangkaraya, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1953 Born
6 Jan 198127.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
23 Jan 200147.6AppointedBishop of Palangkaraya, Indonesia
7 May 200147.9Ordained BishopBishop of Palangkaraya, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Maryadi Sutrisnaatmaka
Bishop Aloysius Maryadi Sutrisnaatmaka M.S.F. (born ) Bishop of Palangkaraya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWedi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palangkaraya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,974

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 May 2018

Quantcast