Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hieronymus Herculanus Bumbun, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop Emeritus of Pontianak, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1937 Born
27 Jul 196729.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Dec 197538.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pontianak, Indonesia
19 Dec 197538.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Capra
27 May 197638.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capra
26 Feb 197739.5AppointedArchbishop of Pontianak, Indonesia
198244.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sanggau, Indonesia
199052.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Sanggau, Indonesia
3 Jun 201476.8RetiredArchbishop of Pontianak, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Hieronymus Herculanus Bumbun
Archbishop Hieronymus Herculanus Bumbun O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pontianak

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMenawai

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pontianak.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018