Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herman Ferdinandus Maria Münninghoff, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jayapura, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1921Born
15 Mar 195331.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 May 197250.4AppointedBishop of Djajapura, Indonesia
10 Sep 197250.7Ordained BishopBishop of Djajapura, Indonesia
29 Aug 199775.7RetiredBishop of Jayapura, Indonesia
7 Feb 201896.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Jayapura, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Herman Ferdinandus Maria Münninghoff
Bishop Herman Ferdinandus Maria Münninghoff O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jayapura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWoerden, Netherlands
Death PlaceWijchen, Netherlands

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: CB, 8 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast