Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Sani Kleden, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Denpasar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1924BornWaebalun
20 Aug 195026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
4 Jul 196137.0AppointedBishop of Denpasar, Indonesia
3 Oct 196137.3Ordained BishopBishop of Denpasar, Indonesia
17 Nov 197248.4DiedBishop of Denpasar, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Paul Sani Kleden:
Bishop Paul Sani Kleden S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Denpasar

  • a priest for 22.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013