Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfred Gonti Pius Datubara, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop Emeritus of Medan, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1934 Born
22 Feb 196430.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Apr 197541.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medan, Indonesia
5 Apr 197541.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Novi
29 Jun 197541.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novi
24 May 197642.2AppointedArchbishop of Medan, Indonesia
12 Feb 200975.0RetiredArchbishop of Medan, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Alfred Gonti Pius Datubara
Archbishop Alfred Gonti Pius Datubara O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Medan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLawe Bekung

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Medan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017