Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Maria Trilaksyanta Pujasumarta

Deceased

Archbishop of Semarang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1949Born
25 Jun 197727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Semarang, Indonesia
17 May 200858.3AppointedBishop of Bandung, Indonesia
16 Jul 200858.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bandung, Indonesia
12 Nov 201060.8AppointedArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia
7 Jan 201161.0InstalledArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia
10 Nov 201565.8DiedArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Johannes Maria Trilaksyanta Pujasumarta
Archbishop Johannes Maria Trilaksyanta Pujasumarta (born , died ) Archbishop of Semarang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolo/Surakarta

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,931
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2010
  • d: CB, 11 Nov 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 May 2017