Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Turang

Archbishop of Kupang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1947 Born
18 Dec 197427.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 199750.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kupang, Indonesia
27 Jul 199750.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Kupang, Indonesia
10 Oct 199750.6SucceededArchbishop of Kupang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Peter Turang
Archbishop Peter Turang (born ) Archbishop of Kupang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTataaran

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kupang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018