Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolaus Adi Seputra, M.S.C.

Archbishop Emeritus of Merauke, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1959 Born
1 Feb 198929.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
7 Apr 200444.3AppointedArchbishop of Merauke, Indonesia
25 Jul 200444.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Merauke, Indonesia
28 Mar 202060.3ResignedArchbishop of Merauke, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Adi Seputra
Archbishop Nicolaus Adi Seputra M.S.C. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Merauke

EventPlace
Birth PlacePurwokerto
Ordained BishopGrounds of, John XXIII Junior High School, Merauke, Archdiocese of Merauke

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Merauke.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,660
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast