Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Longinus Da Cunha

Deceased

Archbishop of Ende, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1945Born
10 Jul 197327.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ende, Indonesia
23 Feb 199650.5AppointedArchbishop of Ende, Indonesia
10 Jul 199650.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ende, Indonesia
6 Apr 200660.6DiedArchbishop of Ende, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Longinus Da Cunha
Archbishop Longinus Da Cunha (born , died ) Archbishop of Ende

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoawae

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,773
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast