Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Pestana Filho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anápolis, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1928Born
5 Oct 195224.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 197850.5AppointedBishop of Anápolis, Goias, Brazil
18 Feb 197950.8Ordained BishopBishop of Anápolis, Goias, Brazil
9 Jun 200476.1RetiredBishop of Anápolis, Goias, Brazil
8 Jan 201182.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Anápolis, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Pestana Filho
Bishop Manuel Pestana Filho (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Anápolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantos

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast