Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantino Amstalden

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Carlos, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1920BornIndaituba
8 Dec 194727.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 197150.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Mar 197150.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
23 May 197150.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
19 Sep 198666.1SucceededBishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Oct 199575.2RetiredBishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Feb 199776.6DiedBishop Emeritus of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Constantino Amstalden
Bishop Constantino Amstalden (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Carlos

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016