Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ático Eusébio da Rocha

Deceased

Archbishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1882Born
27 Aug 190523.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 192240.6AppointedBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
15 Apr 192341.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
17 Dec 192846.7AppointedBishop of Cafelândia, Brazil
9 Jun 192947.2InstalledBishop of Cafelândia, Brazil
16 Dec 193553.7AppointedArchbishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
11 Apr 195068.0DiedArchbishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ático Eusébio da Rocha
Archbishop Ático Eusébio da Rocha (born , died ) Archbishop of Curitiba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInhambupe

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast