Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Fernandes Veloso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1916BornSão Manoel
12 Apr 194125.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 196650.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
23 Mar 196650.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Proconsulari
22 May 196650.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Proconsulari
26 Nov 198165.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
15 Feb 198467.9SucceededBishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
15 Nov 199579.7RetiredBishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
10 Jul 200690.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Fernandes Veloso:
Bishop José Fernandes Veloso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Petrópolis

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Feb 2014