Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Melhado Campos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sorocaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1909BornLimeira
15 Aug 193424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 May 196050.5AppointedBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Jul 196050.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
22 Feb 196555.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sorocaba, Brazil
22 Feb 196555.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hospita
8 Jan 197363.1SucceededBishop of Sorocaba, Brazil
20 Mar 198171.3ResignedBishop of Sorocaba, Brazil
21 Sep 199686.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Sorocaba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Melhado Campos:
Bishop José Melhado Campos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sorocaba

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013