Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfred Cuthbert Gumbinger, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1904Born
28 Jul 192924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Nov 196561.0AppointedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
9 Feb 196661.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
31 Aug 196661.9DiedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Alfred Cuthbert Gumbinger (VIAF: 290420329)
Archbishop Alfred Cuthbert Gumbinger O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Izmir (Smirne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp: MW, 19 Aug 2014
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast