Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-François-Marie Julliot

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Les Gonaïves, Haïti

Titular Bishop of Axomis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1874Born
29 Jun 189924.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Oct 192854.2AppointedBishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti
16 Dec 192854.4Ordained BishopBishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti
13 Jan 193661.4ResignedBishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti
13 Jan 193661.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Axomis
29 Sep 193965.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Les Gonaïves, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Joseph-François-Marie Julliot
Bishop Joseph-François-Marie Julliot (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Les Gonaïves

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvailles-sur-Seiche, France

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,928, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast