Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Marie Le Bihain, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Port-de-Paix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1872BornSaint-Lyphard, France
4 Oct 189624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
9 Oct 192856.0AppointedBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
16 Dec 192856.2Ordained BishopBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
21 May 193562.6DiedBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marie Le Bihain:
Bishop Paul-Marie Le Bihain S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Port-de-Paix

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013