Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie-Alexandre Morice

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Les Cayes

Titular Bishop of Tabae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1852BornLoyat, France
18 Sep 187522.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 189340.5AppointedBishop of Les Cayes, Ha´ti
30 Jul 189340.8Ordained BishopBishop of Les Cayes, Ha´ti
22 Jun 191461.6ResignedBishop of Les Cayes, Ha´ti
22 Jun 191461.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabae
19 Aug 193481.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Les Cayes, Ha´ti

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie-Alexandre Morice:
Bishop Jean-Marie-Alexandre Morice (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Les Cayes

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013