Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roland Minnerath

Archbishop of Dijon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1946 BornSarreguemines
25 Jun 197831.6Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
13 Feb 200457.2AppointedArchbishop of Dijon, France
21 Mar 200457.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Roland Minnerath:
Archbishop Roland Minnerath (born ) Archbishop of Dijon

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Dijon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,549

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013