Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Charles Garnier

Archbishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1944 Born
28 Jun 197026.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Aug 199046.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Luçon, France
21 Oct 199046.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Luçon, France
25 Mar 199146.9SucceededBishop of Luçon, France
7 Dec 200056.6AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for François Charles Garnier
Archbishop François Charles Garnier (born ) Archbishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeaune

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cambrai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,083
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Feb 2017